Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Montgomery, Rader, Howard, Hall, Rogers, Seifried, Kirt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Davis
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 5
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Boatman (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery
|
|
|