House | 05/25/2023 | Veto override message received | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Measure sent to House | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Veto overridden: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Vetoed 04/26/2023 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Kendrix (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Daniels |