Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
SCs named Montgomery, Rader, Howard, Murdock, Rosino, Stewart, Kirt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery
|
|
|