Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB597 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2023