Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Approved by Governor 06/07/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Rader, Pugh, Seifried, Daniels, Bergstrom, Murdock, Dossett
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Rader
|
|
|