Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB623 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2023

Amended

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023