House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Dobrinski (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Paxton |