Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB638 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2023

Amended

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023