Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB648 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill February 9, 2023