Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Rosino, Stanley, Hamilton, Gollihare, Pederson, Kirt, Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Menz
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Burns (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Finance Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Rosino
|
|
|