Senate | 04/20/2023 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Emergency added | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Steagall (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Stanley |