Senate | 06/06/2023 | Approved by Governor 06/06/2023 | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3 | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | HAs adopted | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 4 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Roe (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Haste |