House | 04/06/2023 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Boren | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Strom (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Hicks |