Senate | 06/06/2023 | Approved by Governor 06/06/2023 | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | HAs adopted | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | HAs read | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Title restored | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Cantrell (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Stewart |