Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Pederson, Garvin, Stewart, Daniels, Bergstrom, Young, Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Backed up to General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Measure failed: Ayes: 21 Nays: 25
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|