Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB751 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33
44 Req. No. 549 Page 1 1
55 2
66 3
77 4
88 5
99 6
1010 7
1111 8
1212 9
1313 10
1414 11
1515 12
1616 13
1717 14
1818 15
1919 16
2020 17
2121 18
2222 19
2323 20
2424 21
2525 22
2626 23
2727 24
2828 1
2929 2
3030 3
3131 4
3232 5
3333 6
3434 7
3535 8
3636 9
3737 10
3838 11
3939 12
4040 13
4141 14
4242 15
4343 16
4444 17
4545 18
4646 19
4747 20
4848 21
4949 22
5050 23
5151 24
5252
5353 STATE OF OKLAHOMA
5454
5555 1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023)
5656
5757 SENATE BILL 751 By: Woods
5858
5959
6060
6161
6262
6363 AS INTRODUCED
6464
6565 An Act relating to use tax; amending 68 O.S. 2021,
6666 Section 1403, which re lates to apportionment of
6767 revenues; increasing certain apportionm ents for
6868 certain fiscal years; decreasing certain
6969 apportionments for certa in fiscal years; updating
7070 statutory language; providing an effective date; and
7171 declaring an emergency.
7272
7373
7474
7575 BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF O KLAHOMA:
7676 SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 68 O.S. 2021, Section 1403, is
7777 amended to read as follows:
7878 Section 1403. A. It is hereby declared to be the purpose of
7979 Section 1401 et seq. of this title to pr ovide for the support of the
8080 functions of the state and local government of Oklahoma this state;
8181 and for this purpose an d to this end, it is hereby expressly
8282 provided that the revenues derived hereunder, subject to the
8383 apportionment provided in subsection B of this section and to the
8484 apportionment requir ements for the Oklahoma Tax Commission and
8585 Office of Management and Ent erprise Services Joint Computer
8686 Enhancement Fund provided by Section 265 of this title, are hereby
8787 apportioned as follows:
8888
8989
9090 Req. No. 549 Page 2 1
9191 2
9292 3
9393 4
9494 5
9595 6
9696 7
9797 8
9898 9
9999 10
100100 11
101101 12
102102 13
103103 14
104104 15
105105 16
106106 17
107107 18
108108 19
109109 20
110110 21
111111 22
112112 23
113113 24
114114 1
115115 2
116116 3
117117 4
118118 5
119119 6
120120 7
121121 8
122122 9
123123 10
124124 11
125125 12
126126 13
127127 14
128128 15
129129 16
130130 17
131131 18
132132 19
133133 20
134134 21
135135 22
136136 23
137137 24
138138
139139 1. The following amounts shall be paid by the Tax Commission to
140140 the State Treasurer and placed to the credit of the General Revenue
141141 Fund to be paid out pursuant to direct appropriation by the
142142 Legislature:
143143 Fiscal Year Amount
144144 FY 2004 85.35%
145145 FY 2005 85.14%
146146 FY 2006 85.54%
147147 FY 2007 85.04%
148148 FY 2008 through FY 2022 83.61%
149149 FY 2023 through FY 2027 83.36%
150150 FY 2028 2024 and each fiscal year thereafter 83.61% 100%;
151151 2. The following amounts shall be paid to the State Treasurer
152152 to be placed to the credit of the Education Reform Revolving Fu nd of
153153 the State Department of Educatio n:
154154 a. for FY 2020, ten and forty-six one-hundredths percent
155155 (10.46%),
156156 b. for FY 2021:
157157 (1) for the month beginning July 1, 2020, through the
158158 month ending August 31, 2020, ten and forty -six
159159 one-hundredths percent (10.46% ), and
160160 (2) for the month beginning Sep tember 1, 2020,
161161 through the month ending June 30, 2021, eleven
162162
163163
164164 Req. No. 549 Page 3 1
165165 2
166166 3
167167 4
168168 5
169169 6
170170 7
171171 8
172172 9
173173 10
174174 11
175175 12
176176 13
177177 14
178178 15
179179 16
180180 17
181181 18
182182 19
183183 20
184184 21
185185 22
186186 23
187187 24
188188 1
189189 2
190190 3
191191 4
192192 5
193193 6
194194 7
195195 8
196196 9
197197 10
198198 11
199199 12
200200 13
201201 14
202202 15
203203 16
204204 17
205205 18
206206 19
207207 20
208208 21
209209 22
210210 23
211211 24
212212
213213 and ninety-six one-hundredths percent (11.96%),
214214 and
215215 c. for FY 2022 and each fiscal year thereafter, ten and
216216 forty-six one-hundredths percent (10.46%);
217217 3. The following amounts shall be paid to the State Treasurer
218218 to be placed to the credit of the Teachers ’ Retirement System
219219 Dedicated Revenue Revolving Fund:
220220 Fiscal Year Amount
221221 FY 2003 and FY 2004 3.54%
222222 FY 2005 3.75%
223223 FY 2006 4.0%
224224 FY 2007 4.5%
225225 FY 2008 through FY 2020 5.0%
226226 FY 2021:
227227 a. for the month beginning July
228228 1, 2020, through the month
229229 ending August 31, 2020 5.0%
230230 b. for the month beginning
231231 September 1, 2020, through
232232 the month ending June 30,
233233 2021 3.5%
234234 FY 2022 5.0%
235235 FY 2023 through FY 2027 5.25%
236236 FY 2028 and each fiscal year thereafter 5.0%;
237237
238238
239239 Req. No. 549 Page 4 1
240240 2
241241 3
242242 4
243243 5
244244 6
245245 7
246246 8
247247 9
248248 10
249249 11
250250 12
251251 13
252252 14
253253 15
254254 16
255255 17
256256 18
257257 19
258258 20
259259 21
260260 22
261261 23
262262 24
263263 1
264264 2
265265 3
266266 4
267267 5
268268 6
269269 7
270270 8
271271 9
272272 10
273273 11
274274 12
275275 13
276276 14
277277 15
278278 16
279279 17
280280 18
281281 19
282282 20
283283 21
284284 22
285285 23
286286 24
287287
288288 4. a. except Except as otherwise provided in subparagraph b
289289 of this paragraph, for the fiscal y ear beginning July
290290 1, 2015, and for each fiscal year thereafter through
291291 fiscal year 2023, eighty-seven one-hundredths percent
292292 (0.87%) shall be paid to the State Treasurer to be
293293 further apportioned as follows:
294294 (1) thirty-six percent (36%) shall be placed to t he
295295 credit of the Oklaho ma Tourism Promotion
296296 Revolving Fund, but in no event shall such
297297 apportionment exceed the total amount appo rtioned
298298 pursuant to this division for t he fiscal year
299299 ending on June 30, 2015, and
300300 (2) sixty-four percent (64%) shall be place d to the
301301 credit of the Oklahoma Tourism Capital
302302 Improvement Revolving Fund, but in no event shall
303303 such apportionment exceed the to tal amount
304304 apportioned pursuant to this division for the
305305 fiscal year ending on June 30, 2015, and
306306 b. any amounts which exceed the limitations of
307307 subparagraph a of this paragraph shall be placed to
308308 the credit of the General Revenue Fund; and
309309 5. For the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2015 , and for each
310310 fiscal year thereafter through fiscal year 2023 , six one-hundredths
311311 percent (0.06%) shall be placed to the credit of the Oklahoma
312312
313313
314314 Req. No. 549 Page 5 1
315315 2
316316 3
317317 4
318318 5
319319 6
320320 7
321321 8
322322 9
323323 10
324324 11
325325 12
326326 13
327327 14
328328 15
329329 16
330330 17
331331 18
332332 19
333333 20
334334 21
335335 22
336336 23
337337 24
338338 1
339339 2
340340 3
341341 4
342342 5
343343 6
344344 7
345345 8
346346 9
347347 10
348348 11
349349 12
350350 13
351351 14
352352 15
353353 16
354354 17
355355 18
356356 19
357357 20
358358 21
359359 22
360360 23
361361 24
362362
363363 Historical Society Capital Improvement and Operations Revolving
364364 Fund, but in no event shall such apportionment exceed t he total
365365 amount apportioned pursuant to this paragraph for the fiscal year
366366 ending on June 30, 2015 . Any amounts which exceed the limita tions
367367 of this paragraph shall be placed to the credit of the General
368368 Revenue Fund.
369369 B. Prior to the apportionments other wise provided in this
370370 section, there shall be apportioned to the Education Reform
371371 Revolving Fund of the State Department of Education th e following
372372 amounts in the following state fiscal years:
373373 FY 2019 $19,600,000.00; and
374374 FY 2020 and each year thereafter $20,500,000.00.
375375 SECTION 2. This act shall become effective July 1, 2023.
376376 SECTION 3. It being immediately necessary for the preservation
377377 of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby
378378 declared to exist, by reas on whereof this act shall take effect and
379379 be in full force from and after its passage and approval.
380380
381381 59-1-549 QD 1/18/2023 5:16:37 PM