Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/22/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Jech
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Remove Representative West (Rick) as principal House author and substitute with Representative Johns
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Stewart
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Remove as author Senator Burns; authored by Senator Haste
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative West (Rick) (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Burns
|
|
|