Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB773 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2023

Amended

Bill April 18, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2023