Senate | 05/25/2023 | Filed with Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | To Senate | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Veto overridden: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Veto override message received | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Measure sent to House | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Veto overridden: Ayes: 43 Nays: 5 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Vetoed 04/25/2023 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 4 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Cantrell (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Stewart |