House | 04/04/2023 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Hall |