Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB794 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2023

Amended

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023