Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Naming of Senate conferees rescinded
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Coleman, Thompson (Kristen), Garvin, Paxton, Weaver, Kirt
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 16
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Bashore
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|