House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 12 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 19 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Coauthored by Representative McDugle (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Coleman |