House | 04/04/2023 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, General Government Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Lawson (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Howard |