Senate | 04/20/2023 | Approved by Governor 04/20/2023 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Steagall (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Weaver |