Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/02/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Humphrey
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Munson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Osburn
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Cantrell
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Waldron
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Rader
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Miller (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Pemberton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger)
|
|
|