Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB86 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 29, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023