Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Approved by Governor 06/07/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hefner
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Business and Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Floyd, Coleman, Thompson (Kristen), Weaver, Pugh, Prieto, Brooks
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Blancett (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Floyd
|
|
|