Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB889 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023