Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Approved by Governor 06/07/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Remove as author Senator Rosino; authored by Senator Howard
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Rosino, Howard, Gollihare, Newhouse, Montgomery, Hall, Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Munson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Lawson (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Rosino
|
|
|