Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB91 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 12/29/2022

                             
 
 
Req. No. 588 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) 
 
SENATE BILL 91 	By: Garvin 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to education employee health 
insurance benefits; amending 70 O.S. 2021 , Section 
26-105, which relates to the school district employee 
cafeteria plan; increasing allowance re ceived by 
certain personnel in lieu of flexible benefit 
allowance; requiring certain documentation; updating 
statutory reference; providing an effective date; and 
declaring an emergen cy. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF O KLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     70 O.S. 2021, Section 26 -105, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 26-105. A. 1. The flexible benefit allowance shall be 
used by a school district employee who is participating in the 
cafeteria plan to purchase major medical health care plan coverage 
offered by the school district through a cafeteria plan.  Any excess 
flexible benefit allowance ove r the cost of the major medical 
coverage purchased by the emp loyee who is participating in the 
cafeteria plan may be used to purcha se any of the additional 
benefits offered by the school district or may be taken as taxable 
compensation as provided in subse ction C of this section.   
 
 
Req. No. 588 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
2. Certified personnel who choose n ot to participate in the 
school-district-sponsored cafeteria plan shall r eceive Sixty-nine 
Dollars and seventy-one cents ($69.71) per month as taxable 
compensation in lieu of the flexible benef it allowance amount 
provided in subsection B of this section.  For the fiscal year 
ending June 30, 2024, and each fiscal year thereafter, certified 
personnel who choose not to participate in the school -district-
sponsored cafeteria plan shall receive one-half (1/2) of the 
flexible benefit allowance amount for the given plan year per month 
as taxable compensation in lieu of the full flexible benefit 
allowance amount provided in subsection B of this section. 
3. Support personnel who choose not to participate in the 
school-district-sponsored cafeteria plan shall receive O ne Hundred 
Eighty-nine Dollars and sixty-nine cents ($189.69) per month as 
taxable compensation in lieu of the flexible benefit allowance 
amount provided in subsection B of this section.  For the fiscal 
year ending June 30, 2024, and each fiscal year there after, support 
personnel who choose no t to participate in the school -district-
sponsored cafeteria plan shall receive one-half (1/2) of the 
flexible benefit allowance amount for the given plan year per month 
as taxable compensation i n lieu of the full flexible benefit 
allowance amount provided in subsection B of this section. 
4.  Certified and support personnel who cho ose not to 
participate in the cafeteria plan pursuant to th is subsection shall   
 
 
Req. No. 588 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
provide proof of coverage under a separate health insurance pla n and 
sign an affidavit attesting that the employee is currently covered 
and does not require school -district-sponsored health insurance each 
plan year. 
B.  Each eligible school distri ct employee shall be credited 
annually with a specified amount as a flex ible benefit allowance 
which shall be available for the purchase of benefits.  The amount 
of the flexible benefit allowance credited to each eligible school 
district employee shall be communicated to the employee prior to the 
enrollment period for each pla n year. 
1.  For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2002, the flexible 
benefit allowance amount for certified personnel shall be no less 
than Sixty-nine Dollars and seventy -one cents ($69.71) per month.  
For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2002, the flexible b enefit 
allowance amount for support pe rsonnel shall be no less than One 
Hundred Eighty-nine Dollars and sixty -nine cents ($189.69) per 
month. 
2.  For the fiscal year ending June 30, 20 04, the flexible 
benefit allowance amount for ce rtified personnel shall be no less 
than fifty-eight percent (58%) of the premium amount for the 
HealthChoice (Hi) option plan for an individual offered by the State 
and Education Employees Group Insurance Boa rd.  For the fiscal year 
ending June 30, 2003, a nd each fiscal year ther eafter, the flexible 
benefit allowance amount for support personnel shall be no less than   
 
 
Req. No. 588 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
one hundred percent (100%) of the premium amount for the 
HealthChoice (Hi) option plan for an individual offered by the State 
and Education Employees Group Insurance Board. 
3.  For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2005, and each fiscal 
year thereafter, the flexible benefit allowance amount for certified 
personnel shall be no less than one hundred pe rcent (100%) of the 
premium amount for the Healt hChoice (Hi) option plan for an 
individual offered by the Stat e and Education Employees Group 
Insurance Board. 
C.  If a school district employee who is participating in the 
cafeteria plan elects benefits whos e sum total is less than the 
flexible benefit allowance, the employee sh all receive any excess 
flexible benefit allowance as taxable compensation.  Such taxable 
compensation shall be paid in substantially equal amounts each pay 
period over the plan year.  Except as otherwise provided for in 
subsection D of this section, on ter mination during a plan year, a 
participating school district employee shall have no right to 
receive any taxable cash compensation allocated to the portion of 
the plan year after the t ermination of the employee. 
D.  In cases where t he employee of a school district fulfills 
the terms of their c ontract and terminates employment for the 
subsequent year, the employee shall be entitled to the flexible 
benefit allowance for the remainder of t he current benefit term.  
For purposes of this s ubsection, “benefit term” shall mean the   
 
 
Req. No. 588 	Page 5  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
twelve-month period after the initiation of benefits for the 
position held by the employee. 
E.  Each school district employee shall make an annual election 
of benefits under the plan during an enrollment period to b e held 
prior to the beginning of each plan year.  The enrollme nt period 
dates will be determined annually and will be announced by the 
school district, providing provided the enrollment period shall end 
no later than thirty (30) days before the beginning of the pla n 
year.  Each school district employee shall make an irrevocab le 
advance election for the plan year or the remainder of the plan year 
pursuant to procedures the school district shall prescribe. 
F.  The school district shall prescribe the forms that school 
district employees shall be required to use in making their 
elections, and may prescribe deadlines and other procedures for 
filing the elections. 
G.  School district employees hired after the closing of the 
enrollment period shall be allowed to make an ele ction as provided 
in this act Section 26-101 et seq. of this title . 
H.  A district board of educati on shall have the option of 
providing a flexible benefit allowance to the superintendent of the 
school district in an am ount not more than the amo unt of the 
flexible benefit allowance establishe d for certified personnel in 
subsection B of this section.  Fu nding for the flexible benefit   
 
 
Req. No. 588 	Page 6  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
allowance for a superintendent shall be provided through local 
revenue. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become ef fective July 1, 2023. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereb y 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from an d after its passage and approval. 
 
59-1-588 RD 12/29/2022 3:22:47 PM