Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/05/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 28
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Boren
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Referred to Higher Education and Career Tech
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Withdrawn from Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Rader
|
|
|