Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB930 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2023

Amended

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023