House | 04/06/2023 | Remove Representative Marti as principal House author and substitute with Representative McEntire | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 5 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Garvin |