Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB939 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2023

Amended

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 8, 2023