Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB942 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2023

Amended

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023