Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB961 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023

Amended

Bill April 21, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 19, 2023