Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB976 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill February 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 13, 2023