Senate | 04/19/2023 | Approved by Governor 04/19/2023 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 16 | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 7 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Green |