Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SJR17 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/19/2023

                             
 
 
Req. No. 859 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) 
 
SENATE JOINT 
RESOLUTION 17 	By: Newhouse 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
A Joint Resolution calling a Constitutional 
Convention to modernize, update, or amend the present 
Constitution of the State o f Oklahoma or to propose a 
new Constitution; fixing the time and place thereof; 
providing for selection of delegates to the 
Convention; directing certain members of the 
Legislature and the Governor to form a committee to 
select certain delegates; providing date of 
adjournment; providing for submission of 
constitutional changes to the voters of the state; 
providing for submission of this joint resolution to 
a vote of the people; ordering a special election; 
providing ballot title; and directing filing . 
 
 
 
 
 
WHEREAS, Section 2 of Article XXIV of the Oklahoma Constitution 
requires that a proposal to hold a Constitutional Convention sh all 
be submitted to a vote of the people at least once every twenty (20) 
years; and 
WHEREAS, the last proposal providing for a Constitutional 
Convention was submitted to a vote of the people March 17, 1970; and 
WHEREAS, a State Question to eliminate the re quirement that a 
Constitutional Convention proposal be submitted to the people every   
 
 
Req. No. 859 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
twenty (20) years was defeated at th e General Election held November 
8, 1994; and 
WHEREAS, the current Constitution is the sec ond longest in the 
United States and contains many references to antiquated industries, 
provisions, and terms to b e removed or updated; and 
WHEREAS, it is incumbent u pon the Legislature to enact a law 
providing for a Constitutional Convention and to sub mit the law to a 
vote of the people. 
NOW, THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED BY THE SENATE AND THE HOUSE OF 
REPRESENTATIVES OF THE 1ST SESSION OF THE 59TH OKLAHOMA LEGISLATURE: 
SECTION 1.  The Secretary of State shall refer to the people for 
their approval or rejection, as and in the manner provided by law, 
the question, pursuant specifically to Section 2 of Artic le XXIV of 
the Oklahoma Constitution, of calling a C onstitutional Convention 
for the purpose of modernizing, updating, or amending the current 
Constitution, or to propose a new Constitution for this state. 
SECTION 2.  The Constitutional Con vention shall convene not 
later than twelve o’clock noon, September 12, 2024, in Oklahoma City 
at the State Capitol. 
SECTION 3.  The President Pro Tempore of the Senate, the Speak er 
of the House of Representatives, the Minority Leader of the Senate, 
the Minority leader of the House of Representatives, and the 
Governor, shall form a committee to determine and select the 
delegates to participate in the Con stitutional Convention.   
 
 
Req. No. 859 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SECTION 4.  The Constitutional Convention shall adjourn sine die 
no later than June 30, 2025. 
SECTION 5.  A special election is hereby ordered to be held 
throughout this state on or before March 5, 2024, at which time the 
proposed Constitutional Convention, as set forth in SECTION 1 of 
this resolution, shall be submitted to the people of Oklahoma for 
their approval or rejection as and in the manner provided by law. 
SECTION 6.  The Ballot Title for the proposed question to be put 
before the people as provided herein shall be in the following form: 
BALLOT TITLE 
Legislative Referendum No. ____ State Question No. ____ 
THE GIST OF THE PROPOSITION IS AS FOLLOWS: 
This measure calls a state Co nstitutional Convention.  It would 
begin on September 12, 2024.  It would end by June 30, 2025.  It 
would review the State Cons titution.  It could alter, amend, or 
revise the Constitution.  It could propose a new State 
Constitution. Any change in the Constitu tion or new 
Constitution must be presented for approval to state vot ers.  
This would happen at the General Electio n in 2026. 
SHALL THE PROPOSAL BE APPROVED? 
FOR THE PROPOSAL — YES _____________ 
AGAINST THE PROPOSAL — NO  _____________   
 
 
Req. No. 859 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SECTION 7.  The President Pro Tempore of the Senate shall 
immediately after the passage of this resolution, prepare and file 
one copy thereof, including the Ballot Title set forth in SECTION 6 
hereof, with the Secretary of State and one copy with the Attorney 
General. 
 
59-1-859 KR 1/19/2023 2:21:02 PM