Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1006 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 17, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 22, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 20, 2024

Amended

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023