Senate | 03/28/2024 | Remove as author Senator Rosino; authored by Senator Gollihare | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Ranson | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Munson | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | CR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Lawson |