Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 11 | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate, Alonso-Sandoval, Sims | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | CR; Do Pass Government Modernization and Technology Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization and Technology | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative West (Josh) |