Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1045 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2023
Bill March 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2023

Amended

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023