Senate | 04/13/2023 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Martinez | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Luttrell |