Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1077 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023