Senate | 04/04/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Miller | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Provenzano | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Authored by Senator Jett (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hefner | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Echols | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Talley |