Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1181 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024

Amended

Bill April 23, 2024
Bill February 26, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 9, 2024
Bill February 26, 2024