Senate | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading referred to Finance | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Emergency added | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative McCall |