Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Finance Committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Wolfley | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 6 | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Strom |